Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Services - Provider Reimbursement
Sponsored by
Delegate Hammen
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the Community Services Reimbursement Rate Commission; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to establish and hire an independent contractor to verify a specified cost structure related to inflationary cost adjustments for community services providers; requiring the Department to conduct a specified study and assess specified cost structures in a specified manner; requiring a specified independent contractor to collect and analyze specified data and conduct a specified assessment; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/24/2014 2/26/2014 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/24/2014 3/24/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-801 through 13-810, 16-201.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM