Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Property Tax Credit - Housing for Victims of Domestic Violence PG 432-18
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Prince George's County to grant, by law, a credit against the property tax imposed on certain rental dwellings in Prince George's County provided as transitional housing to victims of domestic violence; authorizing the governing body of Prince George's County to provide, by law, for certain matters relating to the tax credit; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Prince George's County - Property Tax Credit - Housing for Victims of Domestic Violence PG 432-18
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM