Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Foreclosed and Vacant Residential Property - Common Ownership Communities - Payment of Regular Assessments
Sponsored by
Delegates Proctor, Angel, Atterbeary, D. Barnes, Barron, Chang, Clark, Conaway, Dumais, Frush, Haynes, C. Howard, Jackson, Jameson, Kittleman, Krimm, Moon, Mosby, Patterson, Queen, Sanchez, Sophocleus, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, and C. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, with regard to a residential property in a common ownership community that is in foreclosure and vacant, the secured party that files the action to foreclose on the residential property to pay specified regular assessments for common expenses starting 30 days after the action to foreclose is filed and until the property title is recorded by the new owner after the foreclosure sale; and making a secured party that fails to pay regular assessments under the Act subject to a fine of $500 per month of nonpayment.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1184
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Foreclosed and Vacant Residential Property - Common Ownership Communities - Payment of Regular Assessments
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-105.1, 7-114 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM