Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George’s County – School Construction Master Plan Workgroup PG 514–18
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 3:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Prince George's County School Construction Master Plan Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to make recommendations based on its review of the FY2017 Educational Facilities Master Plan; requiring the Workgroup to report its findings by December 31, 2018, to the Prince George's County Executive, the Prince George's County Council, the Prince George's County Board of Education, the Interagency Committee on School Construction, and the Prince George's County House and Senate Delegations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0332
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Prince George’s County – School Construction Master Plan Workgroup PG 514–18
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 3:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM