Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Children's Civil Rights - Equal Parenting Time
Sponsored by
Delegate Carter
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating a rebuttable presumption that joint legal custody and physical custody to each parent for approximately equal periods of time are in the best interest of the child in specified child custody proceedings.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1004
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1132 Session: 2011 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/17/2014 2/17/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM