Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County - Solid Waste Disposal Contracts
Sponsored by
Calvert County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 146
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing Calvert County to enter into a contract for solid waste disposal that may include transportation, may require payment of specified funds or receipt of specified payment, and is for an initial term of not more than 20 years.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Calvert County - Solid Waste Disposal Contracts
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Calvert County - Solid Waste Disposal Contracts
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 146
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Calvert County - Solid Waste Disposal Contracts
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Calvert County - Solid Waste Disposal Contracts
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48
Text - Third - Calvert County - Solid Waste Disposal Contracts
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 49
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46A
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 146
Text - Chapter - Calvert County - Solid Waste Disposal Contracts
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM