Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Disabled Reduced Fare Program - Opioid Treatment Program Patients
Sponsored by
Delegates Wells, Bridges, Cardin, Charkoudian, Kipke, Lehman, and Mosby
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to make available to opioid treatment programs monthly transit passes that are for use by patients of opioid treatment programs who qualify for the administration's Disabled Reduced Fare Program and may be issued to patients on site at opioid treatment programs by staff; requiring the passes to be made available at a reduced price that reflects the price of a monthly pass issued under the Disabled Reduced Fare Program as of October 1, 2020; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0705
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-4)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Transit Administration - Disabled Reduced Fare Program - Opioid Treatment Program Patients
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Transit Administration - Disabled Reduced Fare Program - Opioid Treatment Program Patients
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-4) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Finance 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page