Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Discrimination - Definition of Race - Hair Texture and Hairstyles
Sponsored by
Delegates Smith, Wilkins, Acevero, Anderson, Attar, Atterbeary, Bagnall, D. Barnes, Barron, Bartlett, Barve, Boyce, C. Branch, Bridges, Brooks, Charkoudian, Charles, Conaway, Crutchfield, D.M. Davis, Feldmark, W. Fisher, Harrison, Healey, Henson, Hettleman, Ivey, C. Jackson, Kelly, Kerr, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lopez, Love, Luedtke, Moon, Mosby, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Queen, Sample-Hughes, Shetty, Solomon, Stewart, Turner, Washington, Wells, and Williams
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Defining "race", for the purposes of certain laws prohibiting discrimination, to include certain traits associated with race, including hair texture and certain hairstyles; and defining "protective hairstyle" as a hairstyle including braids, twists, and locks.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0531
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Discrimination - Definition of Race - Hair Texture and Hairstyles
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Discrimination - Definition of Race - Hair Texture and Hairstyles
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-2)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Discrimination - Definition of Race - Hair Texture and Hairstyles
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47A
Text - Third - Discrimination - Definition of Race - Hair Texture and Hairstyles
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (128-2) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 49
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2020 10:21 AM