Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mary Byrd Wyman Memorial Association of Baltimore City
Sponsored by
Delegate Aumann
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the incorporation of the Mary Byrd Wyman Memorial Association of Baltimore City; altering the purpose of the Association; stating the principal address of and the name and address of the resident agent of the Association; prohibiting the Association from issuing capital stock; providing that the business and affairs of the Association is managed by the Board of Trustees; providing for the Board of Trustees; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Reassigned to Economic Matters
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
71
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2016 2/18/2016 Reassigned to Economic Matters 27
House 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 45
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Second Reading Passed 45
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/07/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 67
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Returned Passed 71
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM