Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Recordation of Governing and Charter Documents - Prohibitions
Sponsored by
Delegate McComas
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 653
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from causing to be recorded a governing document or charter document of an entity that the person knows is not authorized by a specified individual or that otherwise does not conform to State law; authorizing a person who believes that a governing document or charter document was recorded in violation of a specified provision of the Act to submit a specified affidavit to the State Department of Assessments and Taxation; requiring the Department to send a specified notice in a specified manner; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {383199/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {409337/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-2)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 653
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {383199/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 49
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 48A
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/07/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {409337/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) 63A
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-2) 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Passed Enrolled 69
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 653
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page