Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Veterans Affairs - Maryland Prisoner of War Medal
Sponsored by
Delegates Simonaire, Buckel, Folden, Glass, Metzgar, and Rose
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating a Maryland Prisoner of War Medal; authorizing, except under specified circumstances, the Governor to award the Medal to any prisoners of war who meet specified residency requirements; requiring the Secretary, in consultation with the Adjutant General, to determine whether to grant prisoner of war status to specified individuals for purposes of consideration for the Medal; establishing the Maryland Prisoner of War Medal Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0032
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM