Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Information Technology - Study of a Common Information Technology Platform for Health Occupations Boards
Sponsored by
Delegates Krebs, Arentz, Carr, Chisholm, Cox, Hornberger, Jacobs, Johnson, Kelly, Kipke, Malone, Mangione, Mautz, McComas, Morgan, Otto, and Reilly
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Information Technology to conduct a certain review of certain information technology platforms used by certain health occupations boards and make certain recommendations on the feasibility and cost of developing a certain common information technology platform; and requiring the Department to report certain findings and recommendations to the Senate Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee and the House Health and Government Operations Committee on or before December 1, 2020.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1045
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Department of Information Technology - Study of a Common Information Technology Platform for Health Occupations Boards
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44
Text - Third - Department of Information Technology - Study of a Common Information Technology Platform for Health Occupations Boards
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 45
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/12/2020 3:11 PM