Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Marijuana
Sponsored by
Delegates Vogt, Anderson, Angel, Arentz, Aumann, Brooks, Carter, Ghrist, Glass, Jalisi, Kittleman, Reilly, Shoemaker, Smith, Sophocleus, Turner, A. Washington, C. Wilson, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding posttraumatic stress disorder under a definition of "debilitating medical condition" for the purposes of specified affirmative defenses to a charge of use or possession of marijuana; establishing a specified affirmative defense for a charge of use or possession of marijuana for a specified qualified veteran patient; establishing a specified written certification for a qualified veteran patient; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0902
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-601 )
(   24-1701 through 24-1705 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM