Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
Sponsored by
Baltimore County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 481
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a procedure for the election and appointment of specified members of the Baltimore County Board of Education; providing for the qualifications, terms of office, and the filling of a vacancy of specified members of the county board; establishing the Baltimore County School Board Nominating Commission; requiring the Governor to make appointments to the Baltimore County Board of Education from a list of nominees submitted by the Commission; providing for an 11th or 12th grade student member of the county board; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1062
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {145769/1
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Special Order until next session (Delegate Hixson) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Hixson) Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Kaiser) {933720/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {604232/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 481
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable with Amendments {145769/1 48
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Special Order until next session (Delegate Hixson) Adopted 48
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Special Order until later today (Delegate Hixson) Adopted 48A
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Kaiser) {933720/1 Adopted 48A
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 49
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
Senate 3/31/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable with Amendments {604232/1 Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 58
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 481
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-109, 3-114, 3-2A-01 through 3-2A-09 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM