Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Terms, Pay, Operations, and Ethical Standards for Various Elected Officials in Prince George's County PG 422-13
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Terms, Pay, Operations, and Ethical Standards for Various Elected Officials in Prince George's County; providing for the chairs and staff for the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation; requiring the Task Force to make recommendations regarding the terms, pay, operations, and ethical standards for various elected officials in Prince George's County; requiring a report on or before November 1, 2013; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {960613/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-2)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {454234/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Motion Special Order until later today (Senator Klausmeier) Rejected (10-34)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/20/2013 2/21/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/05/2013 3/06/2013 Rereferred to Environmental Matters
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2013 3/22/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {960613/1 Report Adopted 52
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Third Reading Passed (132-2) 53
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments {454234/1 Report Adopted 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Motion Special Order until later today (Senator Klausmeier) Rejected (10-34) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 68
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM