Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Howard County - Transfer Tax - Rate Increase Authorization Ho. Co. 26-20
Sponsored by
Howard County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 477
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting moderate income housing units from a certain tax; authorizing the governing body of Howard County to increase the rate of the transfer tax to support certain public purposes; requiring the Director of Finance of Howard County to collect and distribute in certain amounts transfer tax proceeds attributable to an increase in the tax rate to the county general fund to be used for certain purposes; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {505767/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-5)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 477
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Howard County - Transfer Tax - Rate Increase Authorization Ho. Co. 26-20
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments {505767/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Howard County - Transfer Tax - Rate Increase Authorization Ho. Co. 26-20
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (126-5) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 477
Text - Chapter - Howard County - Transfer Tax - Rate Increase Authorization Ho. Co. 26-20
(   20.300, 20.301, 20.304 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page