Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Jurisdiction
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health and Mental Hygiene)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Limiting the jurisdiction of the Board of Review of the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to hear and determine appeals from decisions of the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene and units in the Department; authorizing the Board to hear and determine any appeal from a decision of the Secretary in a contested case concerning an individual's eligibility for or participation in specified programs; providing for the application of the Act to decisions of the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene issued on or after June 1, 2014; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {397876/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/18/2014 2/19/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 48A
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed 48A
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 49
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Finance 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable with Amendments {397876/1 Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 58
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-511, 10-524, 19-330, 19-732, 2-206, 2-207 )
(   10-317, 11-318, 12-316, 12-412, 13-318, 14-408, 15-313, 16-315, 17-512, 18-316, 19-313, 1A-311, 20-308, 20-315, 2-316, 3-316, 4-319, 5-313, 7-320, 8-318, 8-6B-21, 9-309, 9-316 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM