Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Cooperative or Joint Administration of Programs
Sponsored by
Delegate Morhaim
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring in each county and in Baltimore City, by no later than December 31 each year, specified representatives of the county board of education and the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners and a specified governing board to meet and confer on areas of agreement for the cooperative or joint administration of specified programs; and requiring participants to maintain a summary of specified topics and decisions.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/21/2013 2/22/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/05/2013 3/06/2013 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-123 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM