Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Concealment of Public Hazards (Sunshine in Litigation Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Morales, Anderson, Conaway, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Smith, and Sydnor
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a court from entering an order or a judgment that conceals information related to a public hazard; providing that confidentiality provisions that conceal information related to a public hazard are unenforceable; providing that a substantially affected person, including news media, has standing to contest an order, a judgment, an agreement, or a contract that violates the Act; providing that a person with standing may bring an action for declaratory judgment to contest a violation of the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0709
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
(   11-1201, 11-1205 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page