Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking
Sponsored by
Delegates Ebersole, Atterbeary, Angel, Cassilly, Conaway, Dumais, Gibson, Hill, J. Lewis, Lisanti, Malone, McComas, Moon, Morales, Parrott, Proctor, Reilly, Rey, Sanchez, Sydnor, Turner, M. Washington, and Wilson
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to include questions on human trafficking recognition, prevention, and effective reporting as part of the commercial driver's license knowledge test; requiring commercial driver's license training schools to include training on human trafficking recognition, prevention, and effective reporting as part of the curriculum; requiring the Administration to include content on human trafficking recognition, prevention, and effective reporting in its Commercial Driver's License Manual; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0701
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48B
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47
Text - Third - Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48B
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-807, 16-807.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM