Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

HB1462


CH0478

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegates Metzgar, Cullison, Anderton, Arikan, Cox, Forbes, Guyton, Hartman, Hill, Hornberger, Lisanti, McComas, Rose, Shoemaker, Szeliga, and Wilson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 478
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the name of the Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program at Institutions of Higher Education to be the Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program; authorizing food service facilities to store and make available for administration auto-injectable epinephrine for individuals who are experiencing or are believed to be experiencing anaphylaxis when a physician or emergency medical services are not immediately available; altering the purpose of the Program; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0477
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47B
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 478
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program - Revisions
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47B
Text - Third - Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program - Revisions
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Finance 49
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 52
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 478
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:19 PM