Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Deadly Weapons on the Property of an Institution of Higher Education
Sponsored by
Delegate DeBoy
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from carrying a deadly weapon on the property of an institution of higher education; providing specified exceptions to the prohibition; establishing that a person who violates the Act is guilty of a misdemeanor and on conviction is subject to imprisonment not exceeding 3 years or a fine not exceeding $1,000 or both; establishing that a person convicted of violating the Act by carrying or possessing a handgun shall be sentenced under specified provisions of law; and defining "institution of higher education".
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0932
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/21/2013 2/22/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/05/2013 3/06/2013 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2013 3/22/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-102.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM