Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Program Open Space Trust Fund Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Delegates Gaines, B. Barnes, Beidle, Chang, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Ghrist, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Holmes, Jackson, Jalisi, Jones, Kaiser, Knotts, Korman, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, Mautz, McCray, McIntosh, McKay, A. Miller, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Stein, Valderrama, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Program Open Space Trust Fund; requiring specified appropriations from the General Fund to the Fund to repay specified appropriations or transfers from the Fund to the General Fund; providing that the Fund is a continuing, nonlapsing fund not subject to specified provisions of law; providing for the uses, purposes, sources of funding, and investment of money of the Fund; requiring interest earnings of the Fund to be credited to the Fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0927
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-903, 5-903.2 )
(   13-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM