Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Truancy Violations - Reporting of Neglect PG 515-18
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a school employee, in Prince George's County, to report any person to the Prince George's County Department of Social Services for neglect of a child if the person has legal custody or care and control of a child who is between the ages of 5 and 17 and fails to see that the child attends school or receives certain instruction; providing that a certain criminal penalty does not apply in Prince George's County; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Reassigned to Judiciary
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Prince George's County - Truancy Violations - Reporting of Neglect PG 515-18
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Reassigned to Judiciary 28
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-301 )
(   5-701, 5-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM