Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Video on Harms and Risks of Narcotic Drugs
Sponsored by
Delegates Miele, Buckel, Hixson, Hornberger, McComas, McMillan, and Morgan
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education, in collaboration with certain other entities, to develop a certain educational video to provide awareness to high school students on the harms and risks of experimenting with narcotic drugs; requiring each public high school annually to show the video to each student in the school and make a certain certification; authorizing each nonpublic high school annually to show the video to each student in the school; terminating the Act after June 30, 2023; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Video on Harms and Risks of Narcotic Drugs
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Video on Harms and Risks of Narcotic Drugs
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-411.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM