Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Enterprise Fund - Start-Up Businesses
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to give particular consideration to a specified start-up business when lending, granting, or investing money in the Enterprise Fund; and defining "start-up business".
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Enterprise Fund - Start-Up Businesses
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Hearing canceled
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-469, 5-514 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM