Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Sepsis Public Awareness Campaign Workgroup
Sponsored by
Delegates Sample-Hughes, Angel, Cullison, Hill, Patterson, Saab, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health to establish a Sepsis Public Awareness Campaign Workgroup; providing for the membership of the Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to develop a certain public awareness campaign, identify, review, and evaluate certain resources, and identify cost-effective methods for dissemination of certain information; and requiring the Workgroup to report to certain committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2018.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0574
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Sepsis Public Awareness Campaign Workgroup
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Health - Sepsis Public Awareness Campaign Workgroup
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Sepsis Public Awareness Campaign Workgroup
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Sepsis Public Awareness Campaign Workgroup
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 36
Text - Third - Public Health - Sepsis Public Awareness Campaign Workgroup
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 38
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Referred Finance 39
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 55
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Sepsis Public Awareness Campaign Workgroup
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM