Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - County Council and County Executive Special Elections - Voting by Mail
Sponsored by
Delegates Kipke and Beidle
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that voting by mail may be utilized in a special election for a vacancy for the Anne Arundel County Council or the Anne Arundel County Executive; including vacancies for the Anne Arundel County Council or the Anne Arundel County Executive under specified provisions of law concerning voting by mail for special elections; authorizing the Anne Arundel County Council to direct that voting by mail be utilized in specified special elections for Anne Arundel County; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/22/2013 2/25/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/05/2013 3/06/2013 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-501, 9-502, 9-503 through 9-506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM