Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights - Purchase of Residence
Sponsored by
Delegates Angel, Atterbeary, Carter, Morales, and Sydnor
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a transfer of structured settlement payment rights if authorized in an order of court based on a finding that the purpose of the transfer is to purchase a residential dwelling unit in the State to be occupied by the payee as the payee's principal residence and the transferee is a lending institution that has made a commitment to make a loan to the payee secured by a first mortgage or deed of trust on the dwelling unit; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page