Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Fire Safety Construction Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Delegate Branch
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a multifamily dwelling from being constructed using light framed combustible construction in an area with a specified population; authorizing a multifamily dwelling to be constructed using light framed combustible material in an area with a specified population under specified circumstances; requiring the number of stories of a specified building to be measured from the grade plane for a specified purpose; limiting the size of a building that includes specified construction except under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/15/2016 Text - First - Fire Safety Construction Act of 2016
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-511 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM