Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - State Funding - Operating and Capital Funds
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Anderson, Frick, and Ivey
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the rate by which the target per pupil foundation amount is increased in specified fiscal years; requiring that the county boards of education receive a specified grant; and establishing the State goal to provide at least $350,000,000 in each fiscal year to fund public school construction or capital improvement costs.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0958
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/22/2013 2/25/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/05/2013 3/06/2013 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-202, 5-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM