Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Maryland Department of Health - Pay Rates and Staffing Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Acevero, Bridges, Chang, Charles, W. Fisher, Forbes, Haynes, Hettleman, Ivey, M. Jackson, Korman, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Proctor, Reznik, Solomon, Terrasa, Turner, Wells, Wilkins, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that the pay rate for certain employees at Clifton T. Perkins Hospital be at least two grades higher than the employee's pay rate effective June 30, 2020; requiring that the pay rate for certain employees in the Behavioral Health Administration or the Developmental Disabilities Administration be equal to the pay rate effective on July 1, 2020, for similarly trained, qualified, or licensed employees at Clifton T. Perkins Hospital under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0693
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {734661/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-9)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
53A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Personnel - Maryland Department of Health - Pay Rates and Staffing Requirements
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments {734661/1 Adopted 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - State Personnel - Maryland Department of Health - Pay Rates and Staffing Requirements
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (125-9) 51A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 53A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/3/2020 4:46 PM