Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Division of Animal Control - Treatment of Unclaimed Dogs or Cats
Sponsored by
Delegates Cardin, Bromwell, Kach, and Morhaim
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Baltimore County Department of Health, Division of Animal Control to make it a priority to place an unclaimed dog or cat in a suitable home; requiring the Division of Animal Control to establish a specified volunteer program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1021 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/22/2013 2/25/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/12/2013 3/13/2013 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-617 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM