Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County - Competitive Bidding Process
Sponsored by
Calvert County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the method by which the County Commissioners of Calvert County or the official authorized to contract for the county shall invite proposals for specified contracts; and authorizing the Commissioners or the official authorized to contract for the county to use other methods to invite proposals for specified contracts.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Calvert County - Competitive Bidding Process
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Calvert County - Competitive Bidding Process
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Calvert County - Competitive Bidding Process
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Calvert County - Competitive Bidding Process
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page