Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Qualifying Patients and Caregivers - Immunity
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young, Barron, Cullison, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Hill, Kelly, Lierman, McCray, Moon, Pena-Melnyk, S. Robinson, Sanchez, Tarlau, Vogt, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that, until medical cannabis is available through a specified dispensary, a qualifying patient, or the caregiver of a qualifying patient, in possession of a 30-day supply of medical cannabis may not be subject to arrest, prosecution, or specified penalties or disciplinary action, or be denied any right or privilege, for the medical use of cannabis; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-3304, 13-3313 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM