Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Medical Records - Disclosure in Response to Compulsory Process
Sponsored by
Delegate Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which a health care provider is required to disclose a medical record without the authorization of a person in interest; altering requirements for a notice to be sent to specified parties in order to require a health care provider to disclose a medical record under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0557
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {906883/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2013 4/06/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable with Amendments {906883/1 Report Adopted 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 First Reading Senate Rules 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-301, 4-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM