Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Entering a Property to Provide Emergency Assistance or Medical Care
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young, Folden, Frick, Jackson, Lam, Turner, and Vogt
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing immunity from civil liability for a first responder for any act undertaken when entering a property or gaining access to a property in order to provide emergency assistance or medical care in response to a 9-1-1 call provided the act is not one of gross negligence; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0723
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM