Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Services - Homelessness - Emergency Cold Weather Planning
Sponsored by
Delegates Jalisi, Beitzel, Gaines, Haynes, Hettleman, Jones, McComas, McCray, A. Miller, Morhaim, S. Robinson, Sophocleus, Stein, Szeliga, Tarlau, Valentino-Smith, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing an emergency cold weather council in each county; establishing the membership of emergency cold weather councils; requiring emergency cold weather councils to create specified plans; requiring local administering agencies to provide a specified plan to the Department of Human Resources on or before October 1 each year; requiring local administering agencies to initiate specified plans under specified conditions; requiring specified agencies to collaborate to create a specified reporting system; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0920
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-441 through 6-447 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM