Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, and Dispensary Licenses - Sale or Transfer and Forfeiture
Sponsored by
Delegates Brooks, Branch, Fennell, and Glenn
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a medical cannabis grower, processor, or dispensary to sell or transfer a license under specified circumstances; requiring specified licensees to forfeit a license under specified circumstances; authorizing the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission to extend the time frame for specified licensees to become operational under specified circumstances; and requiring specified entities buying or obtaining a specified license to meet specified requirements.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Reassigned to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Health - Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, and Dispensary Licenses - Sale or Transfer and Forfeiture
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Reassigned to Health and Government Operations 25
House 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-3311.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM