Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Real Estate Commission – Brokers – Business Succession in the Event of Disability
Sponsored by
Delegates Arentz, Afzali, Aumann, Cluster, Hornberger, Krebs, Long, Mautz, McDonough, Rose, and Shoemaker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing any adult family member of a disabled real estate broker to carry on the business of the disabled broker for 6 months for certain purposes subject to certain qualifications; requiring certain family members to surrender a certain certificate and pocket card and submit certain information to the State Real Estate Commission under certain circumstances; defining "disability" as a total and permanent disability that renders a broker unable to perform real estate brokerage services; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0846
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {943090/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Real Estate Commission – Brokers – Business Succession in the Event of Disability
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Favorable with Amendments {943090/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Real Estate Commission – Brokers – Business Succession in the Event of Disability
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Text - Chapter - State Real Estate Commission – Brokers – Business Succession in the Event of Disability
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page