Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Military Department – Study on Assisting Active Duty Service Members With State Law and Regulatory Compliance
Sponsored by
Delegates Solomon, Brooks, Chang, Charkoudian, Charles, Corderman, Crosby, Ebersole, Healey, Henson, Lehman, McKay, Pena-Melnyk, Rogers, Sample-Hughes, Wivell, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Military Department to study and make recommendations regarding State laws and regulations that unnecessarily burden active duty service members and regarding the establishment of a program to provide assistance to active duty service members seeking to comply with State laws and regulations; requiring the Department to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2020; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Military Department – Study on Assisting Active Duty Service Members With State Law and Regulatory Compliance
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/11/2020 2:36 PM