Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Placement - Prohibition on Human Trafficking, Restrictions on Advertising, and Reporting Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates C. Wilson and Carter
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from knowingly committing specified acts related to rehoming a minor; providing that a person who violates specified prohibitions in the Act is guilty of the felony of human trafficking; prohibiting a person other than the Department of Human Resources or a child placement agency from advertising regarding the placement or acceptance of a child for adoption; authorizing an individual who believes a child is not living with a specified legal custodian to notify a specified local department or law enforcement agency; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0015
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1125 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-301, 11-303 )
(   5-3A-46, 5-3B-33, 5-704.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM