Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Oyster Sanctuaries - Oyster Bar Cleaning and Removal of Diseased Oysters
Sponsored by
Delegates Jacobs, Eckardt, Haddaway-Riccio, Hershey, McDermott, Norman, O'Donnell, Otto, Szeliga, and Weir
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person to catch oysters in an oyster sanctuary using specified equipment under specified circumstances for the purpose of cleaning an oyster bar or removing diseased oysters; authorizing the Department to establish a schedule for the cleaning of oyster bars and the removal of diseased oysters on oyster sanctuaries or portions of oyster sanctuaries; and authorizing the Department to adopt regulations establishing standards and procedures to implement the Act.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/12/2013 3/13/2013 Rereferred to Environmental Matters
House 3/18/2013 3/18/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-1014, 4-1014.1, 4-1014.2, 4-1014.3, 4-1014.4, 4-1201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM