Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Shellfish - Harvesting by Wharf Owners
Sponsored by
Delegate Fisher
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering, from 5 to 10 feet, the distance from certain piers, wharves, or other structures in certain counties within which the owner has exclusive use of the area for growing oysters in a certain manner; altering the manner by which oysters may be grown and harvested in proximity to piers, wharves, or other structures; and providing that certain oysters may not be commercially harvested, sold, or marketed for human consumption.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - Shellfish - Harvesting by Wharf Owners
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Shellfish - Harvesting by Wharf Owners
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {314236/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Natural Resources - Shellfish - Harvesting by Wharf Owners
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources - Shellfish - Harvesting by Wharf Owners
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Natural Resources - Shellfish - Harvesting by Wharf Owners
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natural Resources - Shellfish - Harvesting by Wharf Owners
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable with Amendments {314236/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Natural Resources - Shellfish - Harvesting by Wharf Owners
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources - Shellfish - Harvesting by Wharf Owners
(   4-11A-17, 4-11A-17.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page