Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Towing Companies - Disposal of Abandoned Vehicles
Sponsored by
Delegates Smigiel, McDermott, and Otto
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to issue a salvage certificate to a towing company that takes possession of an abandoned vehicle under specified circumstances; requiring a towing company to provide specified notice to specified persons before applying for a salvage certificate for an abandoned vehicle; altering the scope of specified provisions of law requiring a police department to provide specified notices under specified circumstances if an abandoned vehicle is taken into custody; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/26/2013 2/27/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/12/2013 3/13/2013 Rereferred to Environmental Matters
House 3/18/2013 3/18/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-152, 13-506, 25-201, 25-203, 25-204, 25-205 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM