Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - School Discipline - Training Practices
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Washington and Jackson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to develop and implement certain standardized training practices on student discipline for all public school security personnel; requiring the Department to study certain best practices and consult with certain organizations on certain matters on or before July 1, 2019; and requiring a local school system to provide certain training to certain school security personnel on or before July 1, 2020.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - School Discipline - Training Practices
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Schools - School Discipline - Training Practices
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM