Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Refusal to Take a Blood or Breath Test - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person who is detained for specified alcohol- or drug- related driving offenses from knowingly refusing to take a specified blood or breath test if the person was detained previously for specified alcohol- or drug-related driving offenses and refused to take a blood or breath test; and providing that a violation is punishable by a fine of not more than $1,000 or imprisonment for not more than 1 year or both.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0535 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/26/2013 2/27/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/12/2013 3/13/2013 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-902.2, 27-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM