Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Internet Crimes Against Children Task Force Fund - Establishment (Alicia's Law)
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman and Morales
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that a specified portion of unclaimed lottery prizes be paid to the Internet Crimes Against Children Task Force Fund; establishing the Internet Crimes Against Children Task Force Fund; requiring the Executive Director of the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to administer the Fund; providing that the Fund is a special, nonlapsing fund not subject to specified provisions of law; providing for the uses, purposes, sources of funding, investment of money, and auditing of the Fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0864
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-601 through 4-603 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM