Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Citizens' Advisory Council for the Baltimore Corridor Transit Study - Red Line
Sponsored by
Delegates Oaks, Carter, and Rosenberg
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 657
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a member of the Citizens' Advisory Council for the Baltimore Corridor Transit Study - Red Line is entitled to reimbursement of expenses under the Standard State Travel Regulations, as provided in the State budget.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (118-17)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 657
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/21/2014 2/24/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Rereferred to Environmental Matters
House 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 48
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed 48
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (118-17) 49
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Finance 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2014 3/25/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/25/2014 3/25/2014 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 657
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM