Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Identification Theft - Vulnerable Children
Sponsored by
Delegate Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person, with fraudulent intent, from knowingly and willfully possessing, obtaining, or helping another to possess or obtain personal identifying information of a specified vulnerable child in order to use, sell, or transfer the information to get a benefit, credit, good, service, or other thing of value in the name of the child; prohibiting a person, with fraudulent intent, from knowingly and willfully assuming the identity of a vulnerable child to avoid identification, apprehension, or prosecution for a crime; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0387
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/26/2013 2/27/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/12/2013 3/13/2013 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2013 3/23/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM